Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hammond , Dimitri, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Williams Michael Matthew, against Back Door Investments Llc, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2020 |
CategoryTitle To Real Property |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: November 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CVD:AGREED JUDGMENT (OCA) | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: MAUZY, CATHERINE A) AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT Party: Defendant BACK DOOR INVESTMENTS LLC Party 2: Plaintiff HAMMOND, DIMITRI | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT Event Code: 5265 Party: Defendant BACK DOOR INVESTMENTS LLC | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE UNSIGNED ORDER - AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT Event Code: 5415 | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:CV COUNTERCLAIM Event Code: 636 Adjmt Amount: 80.00 Party: Defendant BACK DOOR INVESTMENTS LLC | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER & ADDITIONAL PLEADING DEFENDANT?S ORIGINAL ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM Event Code: 5151 Party: Defendant BACK DOOR INVESTMENTS LLC | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND APPLICATIONS FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION Event Code: 5050 Party: Plaintiff HAMMOND, DIMITRI | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:GN CIVIL PETITION Event Code: 600 Adjmt Amount: 307.00 Party: Plaintiff HAMMOND, DIMITRI | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | MSF:NEW BOND ID CREATED Event Code: 32 Adjmt Amount: 500.00 Party: Plaintiff HAMMOND, DIMITRI | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NEW:ORIGINAL PETITION/APPL (OCA) Event Code: 4500 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.