Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Horizon Bank Ssb, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Smith Wallace M., against Eric Edmon Hallas, Erics European Motorwerks Llc, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: October 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL Event Code: 5554 | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ISS:ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT Form Number P46-1484 Issued by ARZOLA JESSICA (4746) ISS:ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT Event Code: 4746 Filer: Defendant ERICS EUROPEAN MOTORWERKS LLC | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ASM:ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISS Event Code: 695 Adjmt Amount: 8.00 Party: Plaintiff HORIZON BANK SSB | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE LETTER/EMAIL/CORR - REQUESTING ABSTRACT Event Code: 5415 Party: Plaintiff HORIZON BANK SSB | |
February 27, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED Event Code: 5601 | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CVD:AGREED JUDGMENT (OCA) Event Code: 4611 | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER AGREED FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code: 8225 | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER/WAIVER DEFENDANT?S OBJECTIONS & RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code: 5150 Party: Defendant ERICS EUROPEAN MOTORWERKS LLC | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION PLAINTIFF?S AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code: 5265 | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEADING PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED PETITION Event Code: 5054 Party: Plaintiff HORIZON BANK SSB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.