Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Grandell , Jeffrey, Pacunas , David, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Selden Jonathan Daniel, against Brown Distributing Company Ltd, Collins , Hannah Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts with Maria Cantú Hexsel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria Cantú Hexsel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RETURN MAIL-NOTICE OF ORDER | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: HEXSEL, MARIA CANTU) AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Party: Plaintiff GRANDELL, JEFFREY; Plaintiff PACUNAS, DAVID | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CVD:DISMISSAL/NONSUIT (OCA) | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION AGREED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Party: Plaintiff GRANDELL, JEFFREY; Plaintiff PACUNAS, DAVID | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE PROPOSED ORDER | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER/WAIVER DEFENDANT BROWN DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LTD. S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER Party: Defendant BROWN DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LTD | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION DEFENDANT BROWN DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LTD. S TRADITIONAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Party: Defendant BROWN DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LTD | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE VACATION LETTER NOTICE | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION REMOTE DEPOSITION OF DAVID PACUNAS | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION REMOTE DEPOSITION OF JEFFREY GRANDELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.