Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Degrasse Donald D., against Tariq , Zuhair, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE RETURN MAIL NOTICE OF ORDER Party: Defendant TARIQ, ZUHAIR | |
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE RETURN MAIL ORDER OF NOTICE Party: Defendant TARIQ, ZUHAIR | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: MARTINEZ JONES, AURORA) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CVD:DISMISSAL/NONSUIT (OCA) | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED/PROPOSED ORDER ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Event Code: 5422 Party: Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE Event Code: 5265 Party: Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING OF PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT AND/OR OTHER TRIAL RELATED DOCUMENTS Event Code: 5554 | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:CITATION ISSUE Event Code: 702 Adjmt Amount: 8.00 Party: Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR LETTER/EMAIL/CORR Event Code: 5414 Party: Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:GN CIVIL PETITION Event Code: 600 Adjmt Amount: 307.00 Party: Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.