Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Stone , John Morris, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Valenzuela Veronica, against Audio Visual Services Group Llc, Hyatt Corporation, Tantallon Austin Hotel Llc, Tantallon Austin Llc, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts with Aurora Martinez Jones presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAurora Martinez Jones Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 16, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: October 20, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: October 16, 2020LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: November 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE VACATION LETTER | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 203 TEXAS JOINT INSTITUTE | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 203 ARA DAIGNOSTIC IMAGING | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 203 BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE DALLAS DIAGNOSTIC ASSOCIATION | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION MOTION TO ENTER FIRST AMENDED AGREED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Party: Defendant TANTALLON AUSTIN HOTEL LLC | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE NOTICE OF DEPOSITION ON WRITTEN QUESTIONS Party: Defendant AUDIO VISUAL SERVICES GROUP LLC; Defendant TANTALLON AUSTIN HOTEL LLC | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: MARTINEZ JONES, AURORA) ORDER ON PLAINTIFF S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Party: Plaintiff STONE, JOHN MORRIS | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE PLAINTIFFS DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE PLAINTIFF S DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.