Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Henderson Cleveland Interests Ltd, filed a(n) Tax Appraisal - Tax case represented by Mckenney Hugh L., against Travis Central Appraisal District, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2020 |
CategoryAppraisal Review |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeTax Appraisal |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: October 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER PLAINTIFF'S NON-SUIT Party: Plaintiff HENDERSON CLEVELAND INTERESTS LTD | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE PROPOSED ORDER | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CVD:DISMISSAL/NONSUIT (OCA) | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL Event Code: 5265 Party: Plaintiff HENDERSON CLEVELAND INTERESTS LTD | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER/WAIVER DEFENDANT?S ORIGINAL ANSWER Event Code: 5150 Party: Defendant TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE CITATION TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT Event Code: 4893 Party: Defendant TRAVIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:CITATION ISSUE Event Code: 702 Adjmt Amount: 8.00 Party: Plaintiff HENDERSON CLEVELAND INTERESTS LTD | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:GN CIVIL PETITION Event Code: 600 Adjmt Amount: 307.00 Party: Plaintiff HENDERSON CLEVELAND INTERESTS LTD | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NEW:ORIGINAL PETITION/APPL (OCA) Event Code: 4500 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.