Case Last Refreshed: 6 hours ago
Ragsdill , Jessica, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Ecklund Jennifer Rudenick, against Accor Hotels And Resorts Maryland Llc, Accor Management Fhi, Accor Management Us Inc, Accor Sa, Datto Inc, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts 459th District Court with Maya Guerra Gamble presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaya Guerra Gamble Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
|
Filing Court House459th District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: September 14, 2020LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: October 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION DEFENDANT DATTO INC S MOTION TO PARTIALLY JOIN DEFENDANTS ACCOR HOTEL & RESORTS (MARYLAND) LLC S AND MANCHESTER AUSTIN LLC d/b/a MANCHESTER AUSTIN HOTEL LLC S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE PROPOSED ORDER | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE PROPOSED ORDER | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION DEFENDANTS ACCOR HOTEL & RESORTS (MARYLAND) LLC S AND MANCHESTER AUSTIN LLC d/b/a MANCHESTER AUSTIN HOTEL LLC S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER/WAIVER DEFENDANTS ACCOR HOTEL & RESORTS (MARYLAND) LLC S AND MANCHESTER AUSTIN LLC d/b/a MANCHESTER AUSTIN HOTEL LLC S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE VACATION LETTER | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: GAMBLE, MAYA GUERRA) AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: DOTY, CLEVE W) ORDER ON CONTINUANCE, ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR TRADITIONAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.