Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Long Lori Liane, against Haynes , Kenneth R, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryHome Equity Loan Foreclosure (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 27, 2018ORD:JUDGMENT
Date: March 01, 2019MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: February 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ORD:JUDGMENT | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED RETURN OF SERVICE | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | CERT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED RETURN OF SERVICE | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.