Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia , Cynthia Maria, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case represented by Gorman Terry P., against State Board For Educator Certification, represented by Lutostanski Andrew John, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryAdmin Appeal/Judicial Review (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
ASSIGNMENT BY PRESIDING JUDGE
Date: March 12, 2019FINAL ORDER
Date: June 05, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ORD:JUDGMENT | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERKS RECORD TRANSMITTAL | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | MSF:BILL OF COST FOR CLERK REC | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION CLRKS/REPORTR REC | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NTC:NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.