Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Degrasse Donald D., against Zerra Tejero , Jorge E, represented by Bell Katheryn Cole, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryDebt/Contract (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: February 07, 2019UNSIGNED/PROPOSED ORDER
Date: September 17, 2019ORD:JUDGMENT
Date: September 25, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ORD:JUDGMENT | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED/PROPOSED ORDER | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED/PROPOSED ORDER | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | EXPEDITE ORIG PET RULE 169 | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.