Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shaw , Netasha, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Mahoney Matthew Michael, against Revolution Foods Inc, represented by Cockcroft Darrell Sloan, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Other (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 28, 2018LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: March 18, 2019ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: January 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC OF REMOVAL | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.