Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ford , Patricia Davies, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Hensley Deborah, against Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Valdez Robert Edward, House Robert A., Cuellar Joseph Edward, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryInsurance Claim (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: August 11, 2017MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: March 02, 2016MOTION FOR SEVERANCE
Date: March 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | !AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | OBJECTIONS | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.