Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Olufsen , Bebe, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Spinks Anthony Michael, against Drewelow , Paige, represented by Kinney Robert Emmett, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryDebt/Contract (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: March 28, 2016LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: July 05, 2016MTN:COMPEL/SANCTIONS
Date: August 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | !MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | MTN:COMPEL/SANCTIONS | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE | |
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.