Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Soca Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryGarnishment (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: January 15, 2016ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 30, 2015ORD:JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | ORD:JUDGMENT | |
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.