Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Eaton , Ashley Shanoah, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Nichols , Joshua Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryParent Child Relationship (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: April 12, 2019MTN:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL
Date: April 04, 2019MTN:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL
Date: April 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ORD:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | MTN:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ORD:TEMPORARY ORDERS | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.