Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hersh , Adam, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hersh , Melinda, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce W/Child (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
!ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 27, 2018LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: June 11, 2019LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: September 20, 2019MTN:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL
Date: April 06, 2020!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: January 02, 2019!ANSWER & ADDITIONAL PLEADING
Date: December 31, 2018!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: December 28, 2018!MTN:MODIFY,REDUCE,ENFOR,CONTE
Date: December 28, 2018!AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: January 02, 2019LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: January 24, 2019ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: January 24, 2019LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: January 25, 2019MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: February 08, 2019MTN:MODIFY, REDUCE, ENFO,CONTE
Date: February 12, 2019RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: April 15, 2019LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: March 20, 2019LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: March 01, 2019ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: February 21, 2019ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: March 15, 2019MTN:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL
Date: May 14, 2019MTN:CONTINUANCE
Date: June 05, 2019RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: May 07, 2019MTN:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL
Date: May 06, 2019RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: June 13, 2019ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: March 12, 2020MTN:MODIFY, REDUCE, ENFO,CONTE
Date: September 27, 2019MTN:MODIFY, REDUCE, ENFO,CONTE
Date: March 11, 2020MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: March 12, 2020ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: April 06, 2020ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: March 13, 2020UNSIGNED/PROPOSED ORDER
Date: April 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORD:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL | |
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED/PROPOSED ORDER | |
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event | MTN:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL | |
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | MTN:MODIFY, REDUCE, ENFO,CONTE | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORD:DECREE DIVORCE W/CHILD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.