Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pinto , Flavia, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Blair Rosenthal , Cory, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2018 |
CategoryAppl For Protective Order (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: January 29, 2019!ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 27, 2018ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: July 09, 2019ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: January 08, 2019!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: December 27, 2018ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: January 29, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: May 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | ORD:DECREE DIVORCE W/CHILD | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | CERT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT INABILITY PAY COSTS | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ORD:PROTECTIVE ORDER FAMILY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.