Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Xxxxxxx , Xxxxx, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Kinnaman , Joel, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryRegister Foreign Judgment (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: March 29, 2018!ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 31, 2015!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: December 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | !UNEXE RETURN OF SERVICE | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | !ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | !ORD:APPT ATTY/GUARD AD LITEM | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS RECEIPT | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | !MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | !MTN:MODIFY,REDUCE,ENFOR,CONTE | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | !ORI ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | !AMENDED/SUPPLEMENTED ANSWER | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | !RETURN OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | !MTN:OTHER MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.