Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez , Virginia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Eguia , Alfonso, Aguilar , Antonio Eguia, Vazquez , Julia, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce W/Child (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
!ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 30, 2015!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: April 05, 2016!ORI ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: August 17, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | !ORD:DECREE DIVORCE W/CHILD | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | !ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | !OTH:OTHER FILING | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | !OTH:OTHER FILING | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | !MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | !ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | ORD:RETAIN | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | !OTH:OTHER FILING | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | !NTC:OTHER NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.