Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Salmeron , Deysi, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Villatoro , Jose, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce W/Child (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: February 29, 2016!ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 29, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | !ORD:CONSOLIDATE | |
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | !MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS RECEIPT | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event | !OTH:OTHER FILING | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | !NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | !OTH:OTHER FILING | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.