Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bejarano , Adelita Estella, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Evans James W., against Martinez , Mario D, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce W/Child (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
!REQUEST FINDING FACT CNCL LAW
Date: March 27, 2017!LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: February 08, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: May 10, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: August 18, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: September 20, 2016!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: September 26, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: October 26, 2016!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: October 18, 2016!FINAL ORDER
Date: October 20, 2017!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: January 14, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: April 15, 2016!RESPONSE
Date: April 21, 2016!ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 29, 2015!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: March 08, 2016!ORI ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: January 11, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: January 11, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: May 13, 2016!RESPONSE
Date: May 24, 2016!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: May 25, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: June 13, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: August 03, 2016!LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: August 11, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: August 17, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: August 19, 2016!RESPONSE
Date: August 24, 2016!NTC:NOTICE OF DE NOVO APPEAL
Date: September 06, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: September 13, 2016!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: September 13, 2016OBJECTIONS
Date: September 14, 2016!OBJECTIONS
Date: September 13, 2016!AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: September 21, 2016!AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: September 30, 2016!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: October 07, 2016!MTN:MODIFY,REDUCE,ENFOR,CONTE
Date: October 06, 2016!AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: October 13, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: October 21, 2016!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: November 09, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: October 27, 2016!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: February 23, 2017LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: March 06, 2017!MTN:REVIEW/CLARIFICATION
Date: October 13, 2017!RESPONSE
Date: March 07, 2017!REQUEST FINDING FACT CNCL LAW
Date: March 03, 2017MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: April 15, 2020MTN:MODIFY, REDUCE, ENFO,CONTE
Date: April 15, 2020!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: February 16, 2017ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: April 20, 2020LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: April 21, 2020LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: April 20, 2020OTHER PETITION
Date: April 15, 2020MTN:MODIFY, REDUCE, ENFO,CONTE
Date: April 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ORD:TEMPORARY ORDERS | |
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ISS:NOTICE SHOW CAUSE | |
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | MTN:MODIFY, REDUCE, ENFO,CONTE | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | MTN:MODIFY, REDUCE, ENFO,CONTE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.