Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
F , L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against F , T, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce W/O Child (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
!ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 28, 2015DWOP BLANKET ORDER
Date: May 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | DWOP BLANKET ORDER | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | !ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.