Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Williams, Lynn Keith, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Kameron Mazurek, against Williams, Michael David, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts with Ronald Brad Goodwin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald Brad Goodwin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Case called for final hearing. Judge on the bench in 391st District Court, in TGC Courthouse, all open to the public. Plaintiff Lynn Williams appeared with attorney Kameron Mazurek, via Zoom. Defendant Michael Williams, appeared in person, pro se. Parties announced ready. Evidence heard. Required findings made and Plaintiff's requested relief granted. Mr. Mazurek will prepare final order and present to the Court for signature. BG/dh Case called for final hearing. Judge on the bench in 391st District Court, in TGC Courthouse, all open to the public. Plaintiff Lynn Williams appeared with attorney Kameron Mazurek, via Zoom. Defendant Michael Williams, appeared in person, pro se. Parties announced ready. Evidence heard. Required findings made and Plaintiff's requested relief granted. Mr. Mazurek will prepare final order and present to the Court for signature. BG/dh |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Goodwin, Brad) | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CAUSE TO NONJURYT TRIAL DOCKET ORDER SETTING CAUSE TO NONJURY TRIAL DOCKET Order ORDER SETTING CAUSE TO NONJURY TRIAL DOCKET |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set on Non Jury Docket Motion PLAINITIFF'S MOTION TO SET ON THE NON-JURY DOCKET PLAINITIFF'S MOTION TO SET ON THE NON-JURY DOCKET |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set on Non Jury Docket Motion PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ON THE NON-JURY DOCKET PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ON THE NON-JURY DOCKET |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Goodwin, Brad) Motion for Default Decree Ordering Partition and Sale Motion for Default Decree Ordering Partition and Sale |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT HEARING ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT DECREE ORDERING PARTITION AND SALE Order ORDER TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT HEARING ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT DECREE ORDERING PARTITION AND SALE |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SALE | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NONMILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.