Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Peachtree Settlement Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Julie Pi Evans, against Redacted, Name, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedJune 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Case called for hearing on Petition to Approve Transfer of Structured Settlement Rights. Recorded by Debbie Harris. Due to emergency Orders/Covid-19 pandemic, Court found in the best health/safety interest for all participants to appear via Zoom. Petitioner, Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC, present by attorney Cody McCabe, via Zoom. Respondent payee, M.G., present via Zoom, pro se and wished to proceed without an attorney. Hearing had and evidence and arguments heard. Required findings made and relief granted. Orders signed by the Court. Adjourned. Case called for hearing on Petition to Approve Transfer of Structured Settlement Rights. Recorded by Debbie Harris. Due to emergency Orders/Covid-19 pandemic, Court found in the best health/safety interest for all participants to appear via Zoom. Petitioner, Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC, present by attorney Cody McCabe, via Zoom. Respondent payee, M.G., present via Zoom, pro se and wished to proceed without an attorney. Hearing had and evidence and arguments heard. Required findings made and relief granted. Orders signed by the Court. Adjourned. |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Goodwin, Brad) 05/16/2022 Reset by Court to 06/06/2022 | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Approving sale and Assignment of Structured Annuity Benefits Order Approving sale and Assignment of Structured Annuity Benefits |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice Notice of Hearing |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Filing Amended Petition Amended Petition |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT HEARING FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED ANNUITY REMOTELY AT HEARING FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED ANNUITY |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Setting Hearing (rtnd unsigned 4/26/22) Order Setting Hearing (rtnd unsigned 4/26/22) |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Setting Hearing Order Setting Hearing |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
1396045 petition & exr Original Petition APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED ANNUITY BENEFITS APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED ANNUITY BENEFITS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.