Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Trufant, Alex, Trufant, Aubrey Dean, Jr., Trufant, Aubrey Dean, Sr., filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by James Skinner, against Company, Llc, Integrity Phoenix, Quyen, Tran, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 18, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCANNED CIT/PRECEPT/NOTICE, ETC Served Served |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Service REQUEST Request for Service |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Quyen, Tran Served 08/06/2022 Returned 08/08/2022 Company, LLC, Integrity Phoenix Served 08/06/2022 Returned 08/08/2022 | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Original Petition and Application for Temporary and Permanent Injuctive Relief Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.