Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weaver, Phillip Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Payne, Kathryn Joy, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2015 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Goodwin, Brad) | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Supplemental responses Supplemental responses |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Objection TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery | |
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion for Discovery Control Plan Notice of Resetting for Final Hearing on Motion for Discovery Control Plan Notice of Resetting for Final Hearing |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery (request) (request) |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT FINAL HEARING REMOTELY AT FINAL HEARING |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Office Conference (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Goodwin, Brad) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.