Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Mcguffin, Allison, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts with Ronald Brad Goodwin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald Brad Goodwin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedJune 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissed - (motions- add completed date) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Case called for final hearing; Petitioner, Respondent and Intervenor were all notified, but did not appear. After waiting over 20 minutes with no one appearing, the case was again called, all required findings made and all claims dismissed without prejudice. Order signed containing all orders and findings. Adjourned. BG/dh Case called for final hearing; Petitioner, Respondent and Intervenor were all notified, but did not appear. After waiting over 20 minutes with no one appearing, the case was again called, all required findings made and all claims dismissed without prejudice. Order signed containing all orders and findings. Adjourned. BG/dh |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Goodwin, Brad) | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Setting for District Court REQUEST FOR SETTING REQUEST REQUEST FOR SETTING |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Goodwin, Brad) | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Case called for hearing on Randol Stout's Request to Withdraw as Counsel; Judge on 391st District Court bench in TG County courthouse, all open to public; Due to Emergency Orders/Covid-19 pandemic, all participants appeared via Zoom; Court took judicial notice of the file; Randol Stout, attorney for Jordan McGuffin, present via Zoom; Jordan McGuffin has failed to keep in contact with his counsel and counsel has no way to contact him, and did not appear; Tom Davidson, attorney for Allison McGuffin, appeared via Zoom; Mr. Stout advised that the AG's office does not oppose the motion and they will not appear; Evidence heard from Mr. Stout as to his diligent efforts to locate Mr. McGuffin, but Mr. McGuffin has failed to keep in contact with Mr. Stout's office, has moved, cancelled his phone and has not provided any valid contact information; Motion granted and Order signed by the Court. BG/dh Case called for hearing on Randol Stout's Request to Withdraw as Counsel; Judge on 391st District Court bench in TG County courthouse, all open to public; Due to Emergency Orders/Covid-19 pandemic, all participants appeared via Zoom; Court took judicial notice of the file; Randol Stout, attorney for Jordan McGuffin, present via Zoom; Jordan McGuffin has failed to keep in contact with his counsel and counsel has no way to contact him, and did not appear; Tom Davidson, attorney for Allison McGuffin, appeared via Zoom; Mr. Stout advised that the AG's office does not oppose the motion and they will not appear; Evidence heard from Mr. Stout as to his diligent efforts to locate Mr. McGuffin, but Mr. McGuffin has failed to keep in contact with Mr. Stout's office, has moved, cancelled his phone and has not provided any valid contact information; Motion granted and Order signed by the Court. BG/dh |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT HEARING ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW ORDER TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT HEARING ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
scan@sanangelocopier.com_20200909_174253 Proposed Order Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.