Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Banda, Brandi Michelle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Banda, Mario Lee, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts with Jay K. Weatherby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJay K. Weatherby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE - AGREED (OCA) | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable FINAL HEARING (With Kids) (X) Via ZOOM Reported by: Cindy Saunders Petitioner: (X) Present (X) In person (X) Pro Se; Respondent: (X) Present (X) In person (X) Pro Se; DECREE APPROVED BY: (X) Petitioner (X) Respondent () Respondent’s Attorney () Intervenor () Intervenor’s Attorney DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE: (X) All Parties ready (X) Evidence heard (X) Divorce Granted. FOR KIDS’ SAKE: (X) Both Parents () Mother () Father () Other CONSERVATORSHIP: (X) Parents named JMC; (X) She named Primary JMC with right to designate primary residence of the children (X) without regard to geographical limits CHILD SUPPORT: (X) He to pay $1,000 in child support per month beginning: 11-1-2020 (X) Wage Withholding Ordered (X) Health Insurance per Sec. 154.182 TFC to be provided by () He (X) She (X) Medical support: He to pay $75 per month for 1/2 of children's ins. premium; (X) Uninsured medical expenses to be split 50/50 VISITATION: (X) Standard Possession Order () As set forth on the record and in the decree () Other: PROPERTY AND DEBTS are divided: (X) per Agreed Final Decree of Divorce (X) per settlement agreement as announced on record () per Agreement Incident to Divorce () to party in possession () as noted on inventory in file CHANGE OF NAME: () Petitioner's/Respondent's name changed to: N/A (X) Decree of Divorce signed FINAL HEARING (With Kids) (X) Via ZOOM Reported by: Cindy Saunders Petitioner: (X) Present (X) In person (X) Pro Se; Respondent: (X) Present (X) In person (X) Pro Se; DECREE APPROVED BY: (X) Petitioner (X) Respondent () Respondent’s Attorney () Intervenor () Intervenor’s Attorney DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE: (X) All Parties ready (X) Evidence heard (X) Divorce Granted. FOR KIDS’ SAKE: (X) Both Parents () Mother () Father () Other CONSERVATORSHIP: (X) Parents named JMC; (X) She named Primary JMC with right to designate primary residence of the children (X) without regard to geographical limits CHILD SUPPORT: (X) He to pay $1,000 in child support per month beginning: 11-1-2020 (X) Wage Withholding Ordered (X) Health Insurance per Sec. 154.182 TFC to be provided by () He (X) She (X) Medical support: He to pay $75 per month for 1/2 of children's ins. premium; (X) Uninsured medical expenses to be split 50/50 VISITATION: (X) Standard Possession Order () As set forth on the record and in the decree () Other: PROPERTY AND DEBTS are divided: (X) per Agreed Final Decree of Divorce (X) per settlement agreement as announced on record () per Agreement Incident to Divorce () to party in possession () as noted on inventory in file CHANGE OF NAME: () Petitioner's/Respondent's name changed to: N/A (X) Decree of Divorce signed |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Divorce (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Weatherby, Jay) | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | CERT./KIDS SAKE - PET/MVNT | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | CERT.-KIDS SAKE - DEF/RESPT | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Zoom Hearing | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Note (Public) No Kid's Sake Cert(s) No Kid's Sake Cert(s) |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING PRO SE PRO SE |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.