Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcbride, Christina, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Spencer, Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts with Jay K. Weatherby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJay K. Weatherby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2016 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ORDER WITHHOLDING SENT TO CITY OF SAN ANGELO - SIGNED FOR BY S ALLEN 9/10/20 SENT TO CITY OF SAN ANGELO - SIGNED FOR BY S ALLEN 9/10/20 |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MODIFICATION (enter completed date) | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | EMPLOYER'S ORDER WITHHOLDING EARNINGS | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Weatherby, Jay) Objection to Order in Suit to Modify P/C Rel Objection to Order in Suit to Modify P/C Rel |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable HEARING ON OBJECTION TO ORDER No evidence heard; Court conferenced with counsel and resolved issue. HEARING ON OBJECTION TO ORDER No evidence heard; Court conferenced with counsel and resolved issue. |
|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE Objection to Final Order Objection to Final Order |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable FINAL MODIFICATION HEARING - VIA ZOOM Reported by Audie Pritchard Petitioner present with James Sadler; Respondent present with Stephanie Goodman; All parties announced ready; Opening statements by each party; Petitioner's Exhibits 1, 2 and 3 admitted without objection; Evidence heard - Petitioner called Christina McBride; Petitioner rests; Respondent called Benjamin Spencer; Respondent rests; Both parties closed; Argument of counsel heard; Court orders that child support be set according to Family Code guidelines; No retroactive child support ordered; Court removed previous no-contact order; Court removed "morality" clause; Mr. Sadler to prepare the order. FINAL MODIFICATION HEARING - VIA ZOOM Reported by Audie Pritchard Petitioner present with James Sadler; Respondent present with Stephanie Goodman; All parties announced ready; Opening statements by each party; Petitioner's Exhibits 1, 2 and 3 admitted without objection; Evidence heard - Petitioner called Christina McBride; Petitioner rests; Respondent called Benjamin Spencer; Respondent rests; Both parties closed; Argument of counsel heard; Court orders that child support be set according to Family Code guidelines; No retroactive child support ordered; Court removed previous no-contact order; Court removed "morality" clause; Mr. Sadler to prepare the order. |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Modification Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Weatherby, Jay) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.