Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mckenzie, Christopher Ray, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Coldwell, Lana, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable GBW/LD. Hearing On S. McKillop's Motion to Withdraw, GBW/LD Remote video/Audio conference, pursuant to the emergency orders of the Texas Supreme Court and Court of Criminal Appeals. S. McKillop here as was her client L. Coldwell. F. Brigman not here - he was in court in Midland, Fed. Court called the case and first explained that Court cannot give legal advice, gives notice of hearings to all attys, not just one side, but does not give notice to clients because that is the atty's job and prerogative. As to Motion to Withdraw, Ms. McKillop argued her reasons, including a conduct rule problem involving a prior order of this court. Gave Ms. Coldwell time to respond. Then, Court granted her motion to withdraw. Ms. Coldwell gave her mailing and email address and said she could retain another atty within 2 weeks. The court will set a pretrial hearing for a status report but not within the next 2 weeks. Ms. Coldwell's address: 555 Smith Blvd, #707, SA 76905 Email: lanarecio@yahoo.com GBW/LD. Hearing On S. McKillop's Motion to Withdraw, GBW/LD Remote video/Audio conference, pursuant to the emergency orders of the Texas Supreme Court and Court of Criminal Appeals. S. McKillop here as was her client L. Coldwell. F. Brigman not here - he was in court in Midland, Fed. Court called the case and first explained that Court cannot give legal advice, gives notice of hearings to all attys, not just one side, but does not give notice to clients because that is the atty's job and prerogative. As to Motion to Withdraw, Ms. McKillop argued her reasons, including a conduct rule problem involving a prior order of this court. Gave Ms. Coldwell time to respond. Then, Court granted her motion to withdraw. Ms. Coldwell gave her mailing and email address and said she could retain another atty within 2 weeks. The court will set a pretrial hearing for a status report but not within the next 2 weeks. Ms. Coldwell's address: 555 Smith Blvd, #707, SA 76905 Email: lanarecio@yahoo |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Woodward, Ben) 10/13/2020 Reset by Court to 10/20/2020 | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance (Judicial Officer: Woodward, Ben ) McKillop's Motion to Withdraw McKillop's Motion to Withdraw |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Hearing on Motion to Withdraw, GBW/LD. S. McKillop here and F. Brigman here. Lana Coldwell was expected to appear but she had not appeared on AV internet call by shortly after 10:00 a.m. Ms. McKillop needed to attend another event and because Ms. Coldwell had expressed an interest to be here, before hearing any argument or evidence, the Court continued the hearing to early next week. Hearing on Motion to Withdraw, GBW/LD. S. McKillop here and F. Brigman here. Lana Coldwell was expected to appear but she had not appeared on AV internet call by shortly after 10:00 a.m. Ms. McKillop needed to attend another event and because Ms. Coldwell had expressed an interest to be here, before hearing any argument or evidence, the Court continued the hearing to early next week. |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodward, Ben) | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter from Judge Woodward Letter Letter from Judge Woodward |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Email Correspondence Email Correspondence |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR ZOOM HEARING | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF ASSIGNMENT AND CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES Notice NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF ASSIGNMENT AND CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.