Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Calhoun, Alicia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Calhoun, Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts with Jay K. Weatherby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJay K. Weatherby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM/PETITION/CROSSACTION | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Letter emailed to counsel with the findings and orders of the Court. Letter emailed to counsel with the findings and orders of the Court. |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order CONCERNING CAUSE NUMBERS A200533F AND C200552F (JAY WEATHERBY) CONCERNING CAUSE NUMBERS A200533F AND C200552F (JAY WEATHERBY) |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable 10-19-2020 HEARING ON PO C-20-0552-F AND TO (FROM TWO SEPARATE CAUSE NUMBERS) (X) VIA ZOOM Reported by Audie Pritchard; Applicant on PO (and Respondent on TO) Samuel Calhoun appeared with Allison Neal and Maria Toscano; Respondent on PO (and Petitioner on TO) Alicia Calhoun appeared with Kirk Hawkins; All parties announced ready; Rule invoked - witnesses sworn, admonished, and removed to the waiting room; The Court addressed Motion to Quash Subpoenas filed for Det. Bobby Elrod (by DA Stuart Holden) and Christine McGill (by City Attorney Brandon Dyson) - both motions granted, witnesses and counsel released; Evidence heard - Applicant called Jacob Alexander SAPD, Brittany Medrano CPS, Allison Carter CPS, Lori Lankford, Samuel Calhoun (Applicant's 1 [photo of wall]; 2 [photo of Aiden's head]; 3, 7, 8, 9, 11, 12, 13, 14 and 15 [text messages]; 17, 18 and 19 [audio recording]; 20 [photo of wall damage]; 21 [photo of hole in wall]; 22 [text message] admitted without objection); Applicant's Exhibit 16 was never offered; Ex Parte Protective Order is extended through October 23, 2020. Matter recessed until 10-22 @ 9:00 a.m. 10-19-2020 HEARING ON PO C-20-0552-F AND TO (FROM TWO SEPARATE CAUSE NUMBERS) (X) VIA ZOOM Reported by Audie Pritchard; Applicant on PO (and Respondent on TO) Samuel Calhoun appeared with Allison Neal and Maria Toscano; Respondent on PO (and Petitioner on TO) Alicia Calhoun appeared with Kirk Hawkins; All parties announced ready; Rule invoked - witnesses sworn, admonished, and removed to the waiting room; The Court addressed Motion to Quash Subpoenas filed for Det. Bobby Elrod (by DA Stuart Holden) and Christine McGill (by City Attorney Brandon Dyson) - both motions granted, witnesses and counsel released; Evidence heard - Applicant called Jacob Alexander SAPD, Brittany Medrano CPS, Allison Carter CPS, Lori Lankford, Samuel Calhoun (Applicant's 1 [photo of wall]; 2 [photo of Aiden's head]; 3, 7, 8, 9, 11, 12, 13, 14 and 15 [text messages]; 17, 18 and 19 [audio recording]; 20 [photo of wall damage]; 21 [photo of hole in wall]; 22 [text message] admitted without objection); Applicant's Exhibit 16 was never offered; Ex Parte Protective Order is extended through October 23, 2020. Matter recessed until 10-22 @ 9:00 a.m. |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable 10-19-2020 The Court conferred with the child, Noah Calhoun, via Zoom. Court Reporter Audie Pritchard attended the conference as an observer. 10-19-2020 The Court conferred with the child, Noah Calhoun, via Zoom. Court Reporter Audie Pritchard attended the conference as an observer. |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Divorce (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Weatherby, Jay) | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Divorce (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Weatherby, Jay) | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Weatherby, Jay) Motion to Confer with Child Motion to Confer with Child |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion AGREED MOTION FOR JUDGE TO CONFER WITH CHILD AGREED MOTION FOR JUDGE TO CONFER WITH CHILD |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY Affidavit of Free Legal Services Affidavit of Free Legal Services |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.