Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carter, Andrew George, Iii, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Carter, Iris Rene, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE - DEFAULT | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Default Judgment (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Dusek, Carmen) | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Case called for final hearing on Zoom. B Raymondpresent w/ Pet. Resp served w/ Citation but did not answer or appear. No children. Property awarded to party in possession. H to keep 2016 Chevy vehicle & bear responsibility for debt/loan. H & W to each keep own retirement and bank accounts. Debts incurred after date of separation are responsibility of party who incurred debt. Divorce granted. Decree will be signed upon submission. CSD/cw Case called for final hearing on Zoom. B Raymondpresent w/ Pet. Resp served w/ Citation but did not answer or appear. No children. Property awarded to party in possession. H to keep 2016 Chevy vehicle & bear responsibility for debt/loan. H & W to each keep own retirement and bank accounts. Debts incurred after date of separation are responsibility of party who incurred debt. Divorce granted. Decree will be signed upon submission. CSD/cw |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
SCANNED CIT/PRECEPT/NOTICE, ETC -SERVED -SERVED |
|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Carter, Iris Rene Served 07/07/2020 Returned 07/14/2020 | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.