Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Williams, Terrie May, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Williams, Bobby Lee, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Divorce (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Dusek, Carmen) 09/02/2020 Reset by Court to 09/04/2020 | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL DECREE - AGREED (OCA) WIFE TO CHANGE NAME: TERRI MAY EVANS WIFE TO CHANGE NAME: TERRI MAY EVANS |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Case called for final hearing. No party appeared. Ct will place on dismissal docket to confirm parties desire to proceed. CSD Case called for final hearing. No party appeared. Ct will place on dismissal docket to confirm parties desire to proceed. CSD |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RESET NOTICE OF HEARING RESET NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Divorce (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Dusek, Carmen) | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Note (Public) 8/7/20 Case called--Pet- Ms. Williams pro se-- Court advised Pet that before the court can hear the divorce that Pet. will need to submit a proposed divorce decree -- she used an on line source for her pleadings and Ct explained that she would need to return to the source get a copy of the decree then she will need to bring it to the Ct Administrator's office for the 51st Dist Ct -- after she does that then the case can be reset for a final hearing.---BLW/AP 8/7/20 Case called--Pet- Ms. Williams pro se-- Court advised Pet that before the court can hear the divorce that Pet. will need to submit a proposed divorce decree -- she used an on line source for her pleadings and Ct explained that she would need to return to the source get a copy of the decree then she will need to bring it to the Ct Administrator's office for the 51st Dist Ct -- after she does that then the case can be reset for a final hearing.---BLW/AP |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order FOR PROCEDURES IN ZOOM HEARINGS IN THE 51ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT OF TEXAS FOR PROCEDURES IN ZOOM HEARINGS IN THE 51ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT OF TEXAS |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Zoom Hearing NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING |
|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing (Judicial Officer: Dusek, Carmen ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.