Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Boyd, Dora Angelica, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts with Carmen Symes Dusek presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarmen Symes Dusek Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 19, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Copy Returned | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL DECREE - DEFAULT WIFE TO CHANGE NAME - DORA ANGELICA DENA WIFE TO CHANGE NAME - DORA ANGELICA DENA |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Pet present pro se. M Stahr for AG. Resp not present but notified of hearing. Only issue is divorce & property division. All issues re 1 child of marriage addressed in D16-0484AG & no changes requested to conservatorship or support in this case. Property already divided & awarded to party in possession. Parties responsible for own debts incurred after 4/1/2014. Name change granted. Divorce granted. Decree signed. CSD/cw Pet present pro se. M Stahr for AG. Resp not present but notified of hearing. Only issue is divorce & property division. All issues re 1 child of marriage addressed in D16-0484AG & no changes requested to conservatorship or support in this case. Property already divided & awarded to party in possession. Parties responsible for own debts incurred after 4/1/2014. Name change granted. Divorce granted. Decree signed. CSD/cw |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Dusek, Carmen) | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Zoom Hearing NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR HEARING | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Divorce Other CANCELED Divorce (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Dusek, Carmen) Other 08/11/2020 Reset by Court to 08/24/2020 08/11/2020 Reset by Court to 08/17/2020 08/24/2020 Reset by Court to 08/11/2020 |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reset A190359F NOTICE OF HEARING RESET NOTICE OF HEARING RESET NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
a190359f novh Notice of Zoom Hearing NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.