Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Er Opco Wc, Llc Dba Wesley Court, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Katie Carr Jacobs, against Matthews, Betty, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with McAuliffe, Mike presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAuliffe, Mike Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 28, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment For Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing (2:15 PM) (Judicial Officer McAuliffe, Mike) Result: Other
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Attorney for Plaintiff, Katy Jacobs, was present, Defendant did not show. Judgment for Plaintiff for $1,550.00 + attorney fees of $ $1,996.80 for a total of $3,546.83. Attorney for Plaintiff, Katy Jacobs, was present, Defendant did not show. Judgment for Plaintiff for $1,550.00 + attorney fees of $ $1,996.80 for a total of $3,546.83. Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion For Entry Of Default Judgment (Judicial Officer: McAuliffe, Mike )
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Motion
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Filing Amended Amended Filing Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing Other CANCELED Small Claims Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McAuliffe, Mike) Other Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion For Continuance
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order for Continuance; GRANTED for Continuance; GRANTED Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial notice sent
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.