Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Armc, Lp D B A Abilene Regional Medical Center, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Catherine R Hensley, against Tobey, Joel, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 07, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Defendant present, Plaintiff not present. Defendant asked that case be awarded in his favor since he was supposed to hear back from Plaintiff on an agreed amount to pay and he has not heard back from ARMC. Judgment for Defendant. Defendant present, Plaintiff not present. Defendant asked that case be awarded in his favor since he was supposed to hear back from Plaintiff on an agreed amount to pay and he has not heard back from ARMC. Judgment for Defendant. |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer McAuliffe, Mike) | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Trial notice sent | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer McAuliffe, Mike) Result: Other | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Trial notice sent | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Citation Service Tobey, Joel Served 03/13/2020 Response Due 03/27/2020 Returned 03/30/2020 | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA) | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIM CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.