Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Serrano, Consuelo, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Howell, Cindie, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with McAuliffe, Mike presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAuliffe, Mike Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2020 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment For Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Both parties present, Plaintiff had a ledger which showed Defendent still owed $4650 and Defendant stated she had paid rent in cash each month. Defendant did not have any receipts showing she had paid, even with cashiers checks. Judgment for Plaintiff for $4650 + CC of $121, total $4771. Both parties present, Plaintiff had a ledger which showed Defendent still owed $4650 and Defendant stated she had paid rent in cash each month. Defendant did not have any receipts showing she had paid, even with cashiers checks. Judgment for Plaintiff for $4650 + CC of $121, total $4771. Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing Eviction Hearing (9:40 AM) (Judicial Officer McAuliffe, Mike) Result: Other Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation Service Howell, Cindie Served 10/14/2020 Response Due 10/23/2020
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.