Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ivey Property Management, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Ceman, Jordan, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with McAuliffe, Mike presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAuliffe, Mike Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2020 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment For Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Possession Ceman, Jordan Unserved
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing Eviction Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McAuliffe, Mike) Result: Other Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Plaintiff was present, but stated the residence still had belongings inside and the electricity was still on. Plaintiff had not seen Defendant in at least a month. I called TCJ and located Defendant, who is still incarcerated in TCJ. Hearing by phone for Defendant, judgment for Plaintiff for $550 + CC of $121, total $671. Plaintiff was present, but stated the residence still had belongings inside and the electricity was still on. Plaintiff had not seen Defendant in at least a month. I called TCJ and located Defendant, who is still incarcerated in TCJ. Hearing by phone for Defendant, judgment for Plaintiff for $550 + CC of $121, total $671. Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation Service Ceman, Jordan Served 10/14/2020 Response Due 10/23/2020
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.