Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rister, Debra, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Templin, Angel, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with McAuliffe, Mike presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAuliffe, Mike Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 09, 2020 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Possession Templin, Angel Unserved
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing Eviction Hearing (9:05 AM) (Judicial Officer McAuliffe, Mike) Result: Other Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Plaintiff stated Defendant has already moved out months ago and left a relative in the residence. Eviction was for possession and to move the relative, an occupant out. Plaintiff stated Defendant has already moved out months ago and left a relative in the residence. Eviction was for possession and to move the relative, an occupant out. Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation Service Templin, Angel Served 10/13/2020 Response Due 10/22/2020
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.