Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Elaine, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Gough, Don, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Dean, Sparky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDean, Sparky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2020 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing Other CANCELED Eviction Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Dean, Sparky, Dean, Sparky) Other Judge: Dean, Sparky |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Approved CDC Declaration Approved CDC Declaration Judge: Dean, Sparky |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officers Dean, Sparky, Dean, Sparky)
Judge: Dean, Sparky |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation Service Gough, Tiffany Ann Served 10/20/2020 Response Due 10/29/2020 Gough, Don Served 10/20/2020 Response Due 10/29/2020
Judge: Dean, Sparky |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation Service Packet Service Packet Judge: Dean, Sparky |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.