Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cedar Creek Apartments, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Ramirez, Moses Zinaido, Espinoza, Veronica, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Dean, Sparky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDean, Sparky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2020 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment For Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Cedar Creek Apartments - No longer run by DeDe has new management. Crystal is the secretary and said she can handle it if we can't get in touch with DeDe. Called the number DeDe left us this morning and she did not answer. Crystal gave us a different number. We tried that number and it was sunscape apartments. Left a message at sunscape and called the number DeDe gave us an additional time. No answer, left an additional voicemail. Called back to Cedar Creek apartments and left a message for Cedar Creek again. Called Ramirez and Espinoza and got an error message that did not sound like a normal your call did not go through message. Called an additional time, and got Ramirez and Espinoza. Called Cedar Creek apartments called AGAIN and Crystal picked up. She could not get in touch with anyone to help with that but is attempting to look in the computer. Affirmative swear in. Lopez for Cedar Creek - Showing they have a balance $3838.42. Has no ledger and can't verify amounts. $3646.98 - court costs added. Ramirez and Espinoza - Lost job due to virus. Gave them last pay check and was making payments, got to the point that the company sold out and he never got paid from them after being let go. Wife was paying every week, DeDe told her that if she didn't have it in full then she couldnt stay. They aren't in the property anymore. He recieved a letter from the apartments that if they moved out he wouldnt be evicted. they turned the keys in on 10/23/2020 but have been out since the last week of September. Did notify DeDe that they were out. He stated Dede quit last week. Amount Ramirez owes is about $2000 flat in his opinnion. August, and half of July. Cedar Creek Apartments - No longer run by DeDe has new management. Crystal is the secretary and said she can handle it if we can't get in touch with DeDe. Called the number DeDe left us this morning and she did not answer. Crystal gave us a different number. We tried that number and it was sunscape apartments. Left a message at sunscape and called the number DeDe gave us an additional time. No answer, left an additional voicemail. Called back to Cedar Creek apartments and left a message for Cedar Creek again. Called Ramirez and Espinoza and got an error message that did not sound like a normal your call did not go through message. Called an additional time, and got Ramirez and Espinoza. Called Cedar Creek apartments called AGAIN and Crystal picked up. She could not get in touch with anyone to help with that but is attempting to look in the computer. Affirmative swear in. Lopez for Cedar Creek - Showing they have a balance $3838.42. Has no ledger and can't verify amounts. $3646.98 - court costs added. Ramirez and Espinoza - Lost job due to virus. Gave them last pay check and was making payments, got to the point that the company sold out and he never got paid from them after being let go. Wife was paying every week, DeDe told her that if she didn't have it in full then she couldnt stay. They aren't in the property anymore. He recieved a letter from the apartments that if they moved out he wouldnt be evicted. they turned the keys in on 10/23/2020 but have been out since the last week of September. Did notify DeDe that they were out. He stated Dede quit last week. Amount Ramirez owes is about $2000 flat in his opinnion. August, and half of July. Judge: Dean, Sparky |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing Eviction Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Dean, Sparky, Dean, Sparky) Judge: Dean, Sparky |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation Service RAMIREZ, MOSES ZINAIDO Served 10/19/2020 Response Due 10/28/2020 Espinoza, Veronica Served 10/19/2020 Response Due 10/28/2020
Judge: Dean, Sparky |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation Issued Issued Judge: Dean, Sparky |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.