Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Abilene Teachers Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with McAuliffe, Mike presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAuliffe, Mike Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2020 |
CategoryDebt Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Abstract
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Defendant not present, and did not file an answer. Judgment for Plaintiff for $9,928.10 + CC of $152.00, total $10,080.10. Defendant not present, and did not file an answer. Judgment for Plaintiff for $9,928.10 + CC of $152.00, total $10,080.10. Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Debt Claim Hearing (9:03 AM) (Judicial Officer McAuliffe, Mike) Result: Other
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Returned Envelope
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial notice sent
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Debt Claim Citation
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Citation Service Ely, Levi D Served 08/26/2020 Response Due 09/09/2020
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.