Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Abilene Teachers Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Carter, Emily K, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with McAuliffe, Mike presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAuliffe, Mike Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2020 |
CategoryDebt Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Defendant not present, wanted a phone hearing, but did not answer when called and waited 45 minutes for her to return the the message I left on her voice mail. Judgment for the Plaintiff for $8,479.50 + CC $92.00, total $8,571.50. Defendant not present, wanted a phone hearing, but did not answer when called and waited 45 minutes for her to return the the message I left on her voice mail. Judgment for the Plaintiff for $8,479.50 + CC $92.00, total $8,571.50. Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Abstract
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Debt Claim Hearing (8:33 AM) (Judicial Officer McAuliffe, Mike) Result: Other
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial notice sent
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Debt Claim Citation
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Citation Service Carter, Emily K Served 07/18/2020 Response Due 09/01/2020 Returned 08/10/2020
Judge: McAuliffe, Mike |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.