Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Franco, Andrea Marie, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Burrell, Thomas Michael, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Patty Wenetschlaeger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatty Wenetschlaeger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2020 |
CategorySuit Affecting Parent Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Sign Order (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wenetschlaeger, Patty) 30Min. Hearing to Sign Temp. Orders 30Min. Hearing to Sign Temp. Orders |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Letter | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Objection Response-Objection and Clarification Letter (as to proposed Temporary Orders) Response-Objection and Clarification Letter (as to proposed Temporary Orders) |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter to Court - Response to clarification letter to Court - Response to clarification letter |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ten Day Letter Second Modified Temporary Orders revised Second Modified Temporary Orders revised |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Ten Day Letter | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List FM61 FM61 |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Agreed Pass CANCELED Pre Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Rotenberry, Paul R.) Agreed Pass 1 hour |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Rotenberry, Paul R.) 1 hour 1 hour |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Assoc Judge's Rept and Memorandum Order for Child Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.