Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Haynes, Daniel Lamar, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Williams, Jharosa Le'Rom, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Hacker, Aleta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHacker, Aleta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2010 |
CategoryAg Paternity |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Modification. Appearance: Pet with atty, C. Mehaffey, Resp pro se. Modification granted. Temporary order adopted with as modified to require whomever has the child to make sure to get the child to his extracurricular activities. Arrearages confirmed as of 2/23/2022 as follows: c/s $1,482.88, m/s $255.02. Ms. Mehaffey to prepare the order. Modification. Appearance: Pet with atty, C. Mehaffey, Resp pro se. Modification granted. Temporary order adopted with as modified to require whomever has the child to make sure to get the child to his extracurricular activities. Arrearages confirmed as of 2/23/2022 as follows: c/s $1,482.88, m/s $255.02. Ms. Mehaffey to prepare the order. Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rotenberry, Paul R.) 1 hour 1 hour Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Rotenberry, Paul R.) 1 hour 1 hour Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Pretrial. Appearances: Pet by atty, C Mehaffey, Resp pro se. Case set on Feb 28, 2022 at 4:00 p.m. Pretrial. Appearances: Pet by atty, C Mehaffey, Resp pro se. Case set on Feb 28, 2022 at 4:00 p.m. Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing Agreed Pass CANCELED Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Rotenberry, Paul R.) Agreed Pass 1 hour Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter to Court Administrator Request reset final hearing Letter Letter to Court Administrator Request reset final hearing Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Rotenberry, Paul R.) 1 hour 1 hour Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.