Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barbian, Michael Shawn, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Stokes, Toni, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Rotenberry, Paul R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRotenberry, Paul R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2005 |
CategoryAll Other Family Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Final Hearing: Pet w/C.Mehaffey, Resp w/K.Postell. Parties announced agreement as to CS. After credits calcluated Mo to pay a total of $1851 in CS. No other CS ordered. Child is 18. (PW) Final Hearing: Pet w/C.Mehaffey, Resp w/K.Postell. Parties announced agreement as to CS. After credits calcluated Mo to pay a total of $1851 in CS. No other CS ordered. Child is 18. (PW) Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing 1 hr Final Hearing (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Wenetschlaeger, Patty) Final Hearing 1 hr Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Termination Of Assignment And Child Support Servic
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order In Suit To Modify Parent-Child Relationship Parent-Child Relationship Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ten Day Letter
Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wenetschlaeger, Patty) Reset by Court from 5-4-20. ag Reset by Court from 5-4-20. ag Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Temporary Hearing: Pet. w/C.Mehaffey, Resp w/K.Postell. Parties announced agreement. JMC with Father designating the residence. All other rights and duties independent. Visits with Mother as agreed. HI with Mother, CS per guideline. Father's CS terminates May 1, 2020. Mehaffey to prepare order. pw Temporary Hearing: Pet. w/C.Mehaffey, Resp w/K.Postell. Parties announced agreement. JMC with Father designating the residence. All other rights and duties independent. Visits with Mother as agreed. HI with Mother, CS per guideline. Father's CS terminates May 1, 2020. Mehaffey to prepare order. pw Judge: Rotenberry, Paul R. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.