Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Canant, Ray Moschel filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2001 |
CategoryLetters Of Testamentary |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2002 | Docket Event |
Decree Confirm Sale Vol./Book 421, Page 859 Vol./Book 421, Page 859 |
|
November 14, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order Of Sale Of Real Property Vol./Book 421, Page 842 Vol./Book 421, Page 842 |
|
November 14, 2002 | Docket Event |
Report Of Sale Of Real Property Vol./Book 421, Page 845 Vol./Book 421, Page 845 |
|
October 30, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Set For Nov. 14, 2002 At 9:30 Am Vol./Book 421, Page 841 Set For Nov. 14, 2002 At 9:30 Am |
|
October 09, 2002 | Docket Event | Citation by Posting | |
October 09, 2002 | Docket Event |
Exhibit to Application to Sell Real Property to Application to Sell Real Property |
|
October 07, 2002 | Docket Event |
Application To Sell Real Property Vol./Book 421, Page 837 Vol./Book 421, Page 837 |
|
May 13, 2002 | Docket Event | Order Approve Inventory | |
May 10, 2002 | Docket Event | Inventory, Appraisement & List of Claims | |
December 17, 2001 | Docket Event |
Oath Ind. Executrix - Joann Wilson Ind. Executrix - Joann Wilson |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.