Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Woodard, Kenneth, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Chaile Allen, against Maldonado, Lanado, Lee'S Quality Concrete, Lp, Bl Key City Metal Buildings, Llc, represented by Billy W. Boone, Tara Gilmore-Low, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Thomas M. Wheeler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas M. Wheeler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
CategoryContract: Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Mtn (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wheeler, Thomas) Def Key City's Traditional and No-Evidence Mtn for SJ Def Key City's Traditional and No-Evidence Mtn for SJ |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendant Lee's Quality Traditional and No-Evidence Motions for Summary Judgment and BL Key City's Traditional and No-Evidence Motions for Summary Judgement; C Allen for Plaintiff; B Boone for Def Lee's Quality; R Dunbar for Def BL Key City; Arguments heard; Under advisement; (TMW) Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendant Lee's Quality Traditional and No-Evidence Motions for Summary Judgment and BL Key City's Traditional and No-Evidence Motions for Summary Judgement; C Allen for Plaintiff; B Boone for Def Lee's Quality; R Dunbar for Def BL Key City; Arguments heard; Under advisement; (TMW) |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer/Response | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer/Response | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer/Response | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Third Amended Original Petition | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Motion for traditional summary judgement for traditional summary judgement |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion For Summary Judgment Defendant Lee's Quality Concrete, LP. and Lanado Maldonado's Traditional and No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant Lee's Quality Concrete, LP. and Lanado Maldonado's Traditional and No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.