Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Foster, Adam, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cade Browning, against Wooten, Joshua, Wooten, Aaron Taylor, Global Medical Response D B A Air Evac Lifeteam, represented by Roy B. Longacre, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Wheeler, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWheeler, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2023 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJune 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment Letter
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wheeler, Thomas) Minor Settlement Minor Settlement Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment Final Judgment
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Compromise Settlement Agreement Compromise Settlement Agreement
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Air Evac Air Evac Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Global Medical Response d/b/a Air Evac Global Medical Response d/b/a Air Evac Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Global Medical Response d/b/a Air Evac Lifeteam Served 06/08/2023 Returned 06/12/2023
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request For Issuance
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter for Hearing for Hearing Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.