Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2021 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response ORIGINAL ANSWER ORIGINAL ANSWER |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Bad Boys Bad Boys |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Bad Boy Bail Bonds #069 Served 04/28/2021 Returned 04/30/2021 | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Joe Joe |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Judgment NISI Judgment NISI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.